I.—sa
24
3rd Nov., 1853. Appointed Provincial Secretary and Treasurer. 11th Sept., 1857 Appointed Receiver of Land Revenue (no salary). 24th June, 1859. Appointed Commissioner of Crown Lands. 24thN"0v.,1864,t07 r, , • -, m 16th Oct., ls £ s . j Colonial Treasurer. 24th Aug., 1866. Colonial Treasurer and Commissioner of Stamp Duties, and Member of Executive. 2nd Sept., 1868. Resignation tendered as Minister of Crown Lands, not accepted. 28th June, 1869. Ceased to be Colonial Treasurer, Commissioner of Stamp Duties, and Member of Executive. 17th Nov., 1869. Resigned as Commissioner of Crown Lands. lltli O^ ' 1872 ( Secretary of Crown Lands and Immigration, and Member of Executive Council. Leave granted from Bth December, 1867, to Bth December, 1868; and extension granted till return from England. Leave granted, without salary, from 22nd December, 1869, to 15th July, 1870. Sums of money received with pension : Salary as Minister, September-October, 1872, £85 2s. 5d.; salary as Speaker of House of Representatives and Legislative Council,
MR. A. DOMETT'S PENSION 14th Feb., 1848. Appointed Colonial Secretary, New Munster. 11th Nov., 1851. Appointed Civil Secretary (no extra pay). Jan., 1854. Appointed Resident Magistrate and Commissioner of Crown Lands, Napier. Bth Sept., 1856. Appointed Commissioner of Crown Lands, Nelson. 6th Aug., 1862. Colonial Secretary and Member of Executive Council. 22nd Aug., 1862. Secretary for Crown Lands (non-political) 30th Oct., 1863. Ceased to be Colonial Secretary and Member of Executive Council. Ist Sept., 1871. Resigned (pensioned). No leave.
Authority; Geoeoe Didsbubt, Government Priuter, Wellington.—lBBl.
Use your Papers Past website account to correct newspaper text.
By creating and using this account you agree to our terms of use.
Your session has expired.