ISLAND AIR GROUP
NEW COMMANDER APPOINTED SIR ROBERT CLARK-HALL (F.0.P.R.) WELLINGTON, Oct 16. The appointment of Air Commodore Sir Robert Clark-Hall, K.8.E., C.M.G., D. 5.0., of Christchurch, as Air Officer Commanding No. 1 (Islands) Group of the Royal New Zealand Air Force was announced to-day by the Minister of Defence, Mr F. Jones. He will replace Air Commodore M, W. Buckley, M.8.E., who is returning for duty in New Zealand. Sir Robert began his career in the Royal Navy, being appointed a sublieutenant in 1902. His flying experience dates from the earliest days of development in the air, and his Royal Aero Club certificate No. 127 is dated August 2, 1911. He was, in fact, largely concerned with the early developments of the aeroplane as a fighting machine, and his experiments in 1913-14 with a two-pounder gun in the nose of a short Pusher float biplane off Calshot have been described as about the most dangerous and gallant exploits in pre-war flying. Service in Last War On the outbreak of war in 1914 Sdr Robert was appointed squadron commander of the Royal Naval Air Service. In February, 1915, he sailed for the Dardanelles in command of H.M.S. Ark Royal, a 7450-ton steamer converted for use as an aircraft carrierIn December, 1915, he was promoted to the rank of Commander R.N. and Wing Commander R.N.A.S. He returned from the Dardanelles in 1916, and next year was appointed- to command No. 1 wing in France, being promoted wing captain, R.N., in December, 1917. On the formation of the Royal Air Force he was given the rank of lieutenant-colonel. After the war Sir Robert held a number of important posts. On August 1, 1919, his name was removed from the Navy List on appointment to a permanent commission in the Royal Air Force with the rank of wing commander. On August 5, 1919, he was promoted to group captain, and appointed to a command in Scotland. On the formation of the P.oyal Air Force Staff College at Andover, in 1922, he was appointed to the staff, and in January, 1922, he was promoted to air commodore.
In May, 1924, he was posted to the Middle East to command the Egyptian Group, and in the following December was appointed chief staff officer to the Middle East Command. In November, 1925, he was appointed to the Royal Air Force in the Mediterranean, and in March, 1929, he was appointed director of equipment at the Air Ministry; and in July, 1931, promoted to air vice marshal. In October, 1931, he was appointed air officer commanding the coastal area, and he was promoted to air marshal in July, 1933. Rejoined Service in 1940 Sir Robert'was placed on the retired list at his own request on August 11, 1934, and; left for New Zealand with his wife and family. In April, 1940, he agreed to assist the R.N.Z.A.F., and was appointed to the command of a South Island station, taking the rank of wing commander. Subsequently he became air officer commanding the Southern Group of the R.N.Z.A.F.. with the rank of air commodore.
One son serving overseas in the R.N.Z.A.F. was recently killed on active service, and Sir Robert's other son is serving in the R.N.Z.N.V.R. in English waters. His daughter is a member of the W.AJV.F. in New Zealand.
Permanent link to this item
https://paperspast.natlib.govt.nz/newspapers/ODT19441017.2.34
Bibliographic details
Otago Daily Times, Issue 25668, 17 October 1944, Page 4
Word Count
552ISLAND AIR GROUP Otago Daily Times, Issue 25668, 17 October 1944, Page 4
Using This Item
Allied Press Ltd is the copyright owner for the Otago Daily Times. You can reproduce in-copyright material from this newspaper for non-commercial use under a Creative Commons New Zealand BY-NC-SA licence. This newspaper is not available for commercial use without the consent of Allied Press Ltd. For advice on reproduction of out-of-copyright material from this newspaper, please refer to the Copyright guide.